Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Saw Yaw Han

Auxiliary Bishop of Yangon, Myanmar

Titular Bishop of Buffada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1968 Born
3 Dec 199426.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Yangon, Myanmar
18 Mar 199526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Yangon, Myanmar
30 Dec 201446.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yangon, Myanmar
30 Dec 201446.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Buffada
12 Apr 201546.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buffada

MicroData Summary for John Saw Yaw Han
Bishop John Saw Yaw Han (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Yangon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHomalim

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Yangon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2014
  • od/c01: CB, 30 Dec 2014
  • ob: CB, 15 Jan 2015
  • c23: CB, 11 Apr 2015
  • c4: CB, 12 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,471

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018