Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kengtung

Dioecesis Kengtunghensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Louis Cakü, Bishop
  • Abraham Than, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 1 January 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Taunggyi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Myanmar
  • Square Kilometers: 45,856 (17,711 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Church, Kyaingtong 06231, Myanmar
  • Telephone: (084)22.015; 22.018

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kengtung
27 April 1927ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale} Prefecture Apostolic of Kengtung (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kengtung
26 May 1950ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kengtung Vicariate Apostolic of Kengtung
Diocese of Kengtung
1 January 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kengtung Diocese of Kengtung
20 November 1975Territory LostDiocese of Kengtung Prefecture Apostolic of Lashio (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kengtung
19507,501900,000.8%23233265212ap1951
Diocese of Kengtung
197026,1681,200,0002.2%410141,869107716ap1971
198034,500579,0006.0%93122,875105110ap1981
198837,024802,0004.6%222241,54297111ap1991
199952,105961,6895.4%31311,680210123ap2000
200054,326971,8965.6%32321,697210823ap2001
200156,849984,8585.8%29291,960211123ap2002
200260,669999,8586.1%23232,637111123ap2003
200345,0181,000,5004.5%25251,80018720ap2004
200658,0001,028,0005.6%30301,9339521ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 22 Jul 2012