Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Lucas Jeimphaung Dau Ze, S.D.B.

Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Lashio, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1962 Born
6 May 199330.5Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Apr 199633.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Oct 201957.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lashio, Myanmar
30 Jan 202057.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Lashio, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Lucas Jeimphaung Dau Ze
Father Lucas Jeimphaung Dau Ze S.D.B. (born ) Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Lashio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHpa Hping, Distretto di Northern Shan State, Prefecture Apostolic of Lashio
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Lashio, Diocese of Lashio

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Lashio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2019
  • ob: CB, 1 Nov 2019
  • c2+: CB, 29 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 30 Dec 2019

Quantcast