Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Saw Gawdy

Coadjutor Bishop of Taungngu, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1955 Born
9 Apr 198327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Toungoo, Myanmar
29 Jun 202064.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Taungngu, Myanmar
29 Nov 202065.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Taungngu, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for John Saw Gawdy
Bishop John Saw Gawdy (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Taungngu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDomapholi, Diocese of Toungoo
Ordained BishopTaungngu, Diocese of Taungngu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Taungngu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 Nov 2020
  • c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 29 Nov 2020

Quantcast