Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-François-Amédée-Adonis-Louis-Joseph de Lauzières de Thémines

Deceased

Bishop of Blois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1742BornMontpellier
4 Aug 177634.5SelectedBishop of Blois, France
16 Sep 177634.6ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
6 Oct 177634.7Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
2 Nov 182987.8DiedBishop of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-François-Amédée-Adonis-Louis-Joseph de Lauzières de Thémines:
Bishop Alexandre-François-Amédée-Adonis-Louis-Joseph de Lauzières de Thémines (born , died ) Bishop of Blois

  • a bishop for 53.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015