Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Antoine de Touchebœuf de Beaumont des Junies

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rennes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1713¹BornJunies
175845.0SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
9 Apr 175946.2ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
13 May 175946.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
20 May 176148.3ResignedBishop of Rennes, France
176249.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Rennes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Jean-Antoine de Touchebœuf de Beaumont des Junies:
Bishop Jean-Antoine de Touchebœuf de Beaumont des Junies (born 1713, died 1762) Bishop Emeritus of Rennes

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015