Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François-Marc-Hilaire de Conzié

Deceased

Bishop of Arras, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1732Born
175926.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 176634.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
14 Apr 176634.2ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
11 May 176634.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
18 Jun 176937.4SelectedBishop of Arras, France
24 Jul 176937.5ResignedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
21 Aug 176937.6ConfirmedBishop of Arras, France
17 Dec 180472.9DiedBishop of Arras, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-François-Marc-Hilaire de Conzié
Bishop Louis-François-Marc-Hilaire de Conzié (born , died ) Bishop of Arras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martin du Mont

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 105, and Page 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast