Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Leopoldo de Bexon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1736BornSarrable
18 May 180265.9SelectedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
25 May 180265.9ConfirmedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
30 May 180266.0Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
15 Sep 180367.3ResignedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
10 Aug 180771.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Claude Leopoldo de Bexon:
Bishop Claude Leopoldo de Bexon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013