Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Cunningham

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1910Born
22 May 193726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
19 Aug 195747.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
19 Aug 195747.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ios
2 Nov 195747.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ios
1 Jul 195847.8AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
16 May 197463.7ResignedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
10 Jul 197463.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Cunningham
Bishop James Cunningham (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeald Grove, Rusholme, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Seminary, Upholland, Skelmersdale, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Death PlaceGeneral, Hospital, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 76
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast