Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Ellis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1899Born
15 Oct 192223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
18 Mar 194444.7AppointedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
1 May 194444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
31 Oct 197475.3RetiredBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 197980.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edward Ellis (VIAF: 89020614)
Bishop Edward Ellis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadford, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Barnabas, Cathedral, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Death PlaceNazareth House, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Barnabas, Cathedral, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 18
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 86
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast