Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Lindsay

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1927Born
19 Jul 195326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
13 Oct 196942.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
13 Oct 196942.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cuncacestre
11 Dec 196942.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cuncacestre
12 Dec 197447.4AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
11 Jan 199264.5ResignedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
19 Jan 200981.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh Lindsay
Bishop Hugh Lindsay (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJesmond, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Cathedral, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Death PlaceBoarbank Hall, Allithwaite, Grange-over-Sands, Cumbria, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Mary, Cathedral, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast