Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Médard Léopold Ouédraogo

Auxiliary Bishop of Ouagadougou

Titular Bishop of Sutunurca

Apostolic Administrator of Dédougou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1953 BornOuagadougou
30 Jun 197926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
28 May 201258.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
28 May 201258.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sutunurca
11 Aug 201259.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sutunurca
3 Sep 201663.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Dédougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Médard Léopold Ouédraogo
Bishop Médard Léopold Ouédraogo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ouagadougou

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Ouagadougou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 May 2012
  • ob: CB, 2 Aug 2012
  • c2+: CB, 12 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,524
  • ab: CB, 10 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Sep 2016