Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Langres

Dioecesis Lingonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Restored: 6 October 1822
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Reims
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,210 (2,398 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nord
  • Official Web Site: https://52.catholique.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 11 rue des Platanes, B.P. 1036, 52008 Chaumont CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 3.25.01.18.18
  • Fax: 3.25.32.56.88

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Langres
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Langres (erected)
9 April 1731Territory LostDiocese of Langres Diocese of Dijon (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Langres (suppressed) Diocese of Dijon
Diocese of Troyes
Diocese of Langres
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Dijon Diocese of Langres
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Langres (from Lyon)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Langres
1950180,000181,84099.0%2442827266155356444ap1951
1970205,000216,70094.6%170271971,04045273444ap1971
1980196,800214,00092.0%123231461,34736175444ap1981
1990205,400223,60091.9%99171161,770734150548ap1991
1999180,000200,00090.0%738812,222101212131ap2000
2000160,000198,00080.8%678752,133101212031ap2001
2001160,000198,00080.8%678752,133121111331ap2002
2002140,000194,87371.8%646702,00012911331ap2003
2003140,000194,87371.8%646702,00017910631ap2004
2004140,000193,76872.3%537602,33317910131ap2005
2013143,200184,03977.8%376433,3301686231ap2014
2016134,400182,13673.8%354393,4461474331ap2017
2019131,000176,13274.4%366423,1191273331ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Langres
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 307
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 178
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 10 Apr 2021

Quantcast