Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Joseph Fillon

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1877Born
29 Jun 190123.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 192951.8AppointedBishop of Langres, France
24 Sep 192952.1Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
24 Dec 193457.3AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
17 Feb 193557.5InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
2 Jan 194365.4DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph Fillon
Archbishop Louis-Joseph Fillon (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVineuil

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast