Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal de Bar

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Administrator of Verdun

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1370¹Born
2 Apr 139525.2AppointedBishop of Langres, France
21 Dec 139727.9AppointedAdministrator of Langres, France
21 Dec 139727.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Dec 139727.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
29 Jun 140939.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 140939.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
22 Sep 141242.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
20 Sep 141343.7AppointedAdministrator of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
10 Jan 142050.0AppointedAdministrator of Verdun, France
3 Mar 142353.1AppointedAdministrator of Poitiers, France
14 Feb 142454.1AppointedAdministrator of Verdun, France
23 Jun 143060.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Bar (VIAF: 316446778)
Louis Cardinal de Bar (born 1370, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrance
Death PlaceVarennes
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Martin Chapel, Notre-Dame-de-l'Assomption, Cathedral, Verdun, Diocese of Verdun, France

  • a priest for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for 32.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Dec 1397
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Mar 2021

Quantcast