Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean des Prez

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Apr 1338AppointedBishop of Langres, France
25 Sep 1342AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
13 Jun 1349DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean des Prez
Bishop Jean des Prez (died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 307, and Page 489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Mar 2021

Quantcast