Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Poitiers

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1306AppointedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
13 Feb 1320AppointedBishop of Langres, France
26 Aug 1325AppointedBishop of Metz, France
17 Aug 1327DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Poitiers
Bishop Louis de Poitiers (died ) Bishop of Metz

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 533, and Page 307
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast