Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Arcy

Deceased

Bishop of Langres, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Dec 1330AppointedBishop of Mende, France
21 Dec 1331AppointedBishop of Autun, France
25 Sep 1342AppointedBishop of Langres, France
13 Aug 1344DiedBishop of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Arcy
Bishop Jean d’Arcy (died ) Bishop of Langres

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 342, and Page 73
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast