Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Chiron

Deceased

Bishop of Langres, France

Titular Bishop of Bamaccora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1885Born
11 Jul 190924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Luçon, France
6 Oct 193954.5AppointedBishop of Langres, France
7 Dec 193954.7Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
15 Jan 196478.8RetiredBishop of Langres, France
15 Jan 196478.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bamaccora
10 Sep 196479.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Chiron
Bishop Louis Chiron (born , died ) Bishop of Langres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngles

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast