Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Marino-Montefeltro

Dioecesis Sammarinensis-Feretrana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Domenico Beneventi, Bishop-Elect
  • Andrea Turazzi, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Montefeltro
9th CenturyErectedDiocese of Montefeltro (erected)
20 February 1938Territory LostDiocese of Montefeltro (Paderno) Diocese of Sarsina
3 January 1942Territory LostDiocese of Montefeltro (St. Marina in Bese) Diocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)
Diocese of San Marino-Montefeltro
22 February 1977Name ChangedDiocese of Montefeltro
Diocese of Rimini (Serravalle and Faetano along with Falciano and Dogana)
Diocese of Sarsina (Rivolparo and Sapigno in Romagnano)
Diocese of San Marino-Montefeltro

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Montefeltro
188639,918.0%2150112OTC
195072,00072,000100.0%1264016643340130123ap1951
196949,78049,800100.0%89301194183211474ap1971
Diocese of San Marino-Montefeltro
198055,25055,50099.5%6824926002783118ap1981
199056,50057,10098.9%542781697288081ap1991
199756,81057,00099.7%5230826921426590ap2000
200057,16259,47096.1%4929787321316681ap2001
200159,00059,44299.3%5227797461296681ap2002
200261,62062,27199.0%5127787901316781ap2003
200363,13065,72596.1%4927768301297081ap2004
200460,73462,59097.0%4926758091286581ap2005
201064,00467,54194.8%5823817907255581ap2011
201465,06369,00094.3%4621679718245881ap2015
201760,25366,11091.1%3118491,2299205181ap2018
202061,40165,13394.3%4315581,0589175081ap2021
202263,11266,44195.0%46196597011225081ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Montefeltro
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 247
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 153
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 186
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 200
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 214
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 705
  • Diocese of San Marino-Montefeltro
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 69, Page 213, to Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 17 Feb 2024