Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Belluzzi

Deceased

Bishop of Camerino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1642Born
14 Aug 167835.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 167835.8AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
18 Sep 167835.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
25 Sep 170259.9AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
15 Feb 171976.3DiedBishop of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Belluzzi
Bishop Bernardino Belluzzi (born , died ) Bishop of Camerino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Marin de Montefeltro

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 139, and Page 200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast