Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Castriani (Crastini), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Mar 1506AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
21 May 1507AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
11 Aug 1510DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Castriani (Crastini)
Bishop Antonio Castriani (Crastini) O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 147, and Page 195
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,506, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast