Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pergolini

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1710³BornMontenuovo
19 Jun 173424.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 176555.3AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
1 May 176555.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
17 Feb 177767.1AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
Aug 1779³69.6DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pergolini:
Bishop Giovanni Pergolini (born ) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 84, and Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013