Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Rabitti

Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara-Comacchio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1936 BornCastellarano
30 Oct 196024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
25 May 199558.5AppointedBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
24 Jun 199558.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
2 Oct 200467.9AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy
28 Nov 200468.0InstalledArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy
1 Dec 201276.0RetiredArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Rabitti (VIAF: 18443681)
Archbishop Paolo Rabitti (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara-Comacchio

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ferrara-Comacchio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd: CB, 17 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,568
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016