Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Terzi

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1736BornCesena
14 Apr 175922.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 177740.7AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
24 Feb 177740.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
27 Oct 180367.4DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Terzi:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Terzi (born , died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013