Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico (Tommaso) Carpegna, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1598³Born
26 Jun 165657.8AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
9 Jul 165657.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
26 Sep 165759.1DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico (Tommaso) Carpegna
Bishop Federico (Tommaso) Carpegna C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScavolino, Diocese of Montefeltro
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro a Montecavallo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rimini, Diocese of Rimini

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 31
  • b/c2/d: AT, 11 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast