Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo de Salemoncellis

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1450AppointedBishop of Focea, Turkey
15 Feb 1450Ordained BishopBishop of Focea, Turkey
27 Oct 1458AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
1459¹DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo de Salemoncellis
Bishop Giacomo de Salemoncellis (died 1459) Bishop of Montefeltro

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGenova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a bishop for 8.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 153, and Page 155
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,667
  • ob: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast