Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Visconti

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1523¹Born
5 Dec 156138.9AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
15 Dec 156138.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
12 Mar 156542.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156542.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
6 Jul 156542.5AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
12 Nov 156542.8DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Visconti (VIAF: 7381233)
Carlo Cardinal Visconti (born 1523, died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceMonte Caballo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
  • a cardinal for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,090
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195, and Page 334
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast