Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Tebaldi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jun 1450AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
17 Dec 1456Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jan 1457AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
3 Aug 1458AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Nov 1458³ResignedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
4 Sep 1466DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Tebaldi
Giacomo Cardinal Tebaldi (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1456
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 153, and Page 200

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast