Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ennio Cardinal Filonardi

Deceased

Administrator of Montefeltro, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1466Born
4 Aug 150337.5AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
22 Dec 153670.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 153771.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
12 Aug 153872.6AppointedAdministrator of Montefeltro, Italy
8 Oct 154680.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
19 Dec 154983.9DiedAdministrator of Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ennio Filonardi
Ennio Cardinal Filonardi (born 1466, died ) Administrator of Montefeltro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBauco
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 12.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331, and Page 195
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast