Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nino Marzoli, C. R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

Titular Bishop of Nara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1938BornPescara
17 Dec 196627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
16 Apr 198849.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
16 Apr 198849.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nara
18 Jun 198849.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nara
28 Aug 199253.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
24 May 200061.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Nino Marzoli:
Bishop Nino Marzoli C. R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,722
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 13 Jun 2015