Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Belisario Santistevan Seoane

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Titular Archbishop of Synnada in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1843Born
1867¹23.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 189046.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
26 Jun 189046.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dausara
5 Apr 189147.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dausara
1 Jun 189147.7SucceededBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
22 Nov 193087.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Synnada in Phrygia
30 Mar 193187.6DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Belisario Santistevan Seoane
Archbishop José Belisario Santistevan Seoane (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz de la Sierra, Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 232, and Page 239
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,488
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast