Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel José Peña

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1847Born
30 Nov 191163.9AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
21 Jul 191264.5Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
10 Aug 191466.6DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Manuel José Peña
Bishop Manuel José Peña (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz de la Sierra, Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
Death PlaceHacienda de Collpani

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 46
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast