Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Vergara Uribe

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1686³BornLima, Peru
11 May 174155.2SelectedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
7 Aug 174155.4ConfirmedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1744¹57.8DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Vergara Uribe:
Bishop Andrés Vergara Uribe (born , died 1744) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 61, Number 280
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 74
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015