Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Domingo González de la Reguera

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1720BornComillas, Spain
16 Dec 177656.4AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1777²56.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
18 Sep 178060.2AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
8 Mar 180584.6DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Domingo González de la Reguera:
Archbishop Juan Domingo González de la Reguera (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 187, and Page 262
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 94, Number 482

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013