Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Gómez

Auxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Semta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1962 Born
9 May 199835.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
27 Aug 199937.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
27 Dec 201856.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
27 Dec 201856.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Semta
19 Mar 201956.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Semta

MicroData Summary for Juan Gómez
Bishop Juan Gómez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComarapa, Diocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
Ordained DeaconCristo Misionero, Church
Ordained PriestSan Lorenzo, Basilica
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cochabamba, Archdiocese of Cochabamba

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cochabamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 28 Dec 2018
  • c2: CB, 4 Mar 2019
  • c34: CB, 17 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast