Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1815Born
21 Dec 183924.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 183924.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 186953.9AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
24 Apr 187054.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
16 May 187761.4DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Rodríguez
Bishop Francisco Javier Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Paz, Diocese of La Paz
Ordained BishopCochabamba, Diocese of Cochabamba

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 232
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,870, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast