Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of El Beni o Beni

Apostolicus Vicariatus Benensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Julio María Elías Montoya, O.F.M., Vicar Apostolic
  • Roberto Bordi, O.F.M., Auxiliary Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Erected: 1 December 1917
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bolivia
  • Square Kilometers: 150,686 (58,202 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Casilla 34, Trinidad [Beni], Bolivia
  • Telephone: (03)4620.246
  • Fax: 4652.015

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
1 December 1917ErectedDiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra Vicariate Apostolic of El Beni o Beni (erected)
29 April 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of El Beni o Beni Vicariate Apostolic of Pando (erected)
1 September 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of El Beni o Beni Vicariate Apostolic of Reyes (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195044,50047,26094.2%885,5628ap1951
196575,00080,00093.8%20203,75011ap1967
197090,10095,00094.8%22224,0952224ap1971
197692,000100,00092.0%121224,181252714ap1977
198095,600109,80087.1%25253,824332519ap1981
1990123,363152,30081.0%118196,492244325ap1991
1999132,000165,90079.6%620265,0762254328ap2000
2000133,800168,30079.5%720274,9552264930ap2001
2001137,266170,10080.7%715226,2392215230ap2002
2002149,400185,00080.8%615217,1143215430ap2003
2003142,340177,92680.0%613197,4913194930ap2004
2004145,898182,37280.0%613197,6783195330ap2005
2010164,808206,01080.0%814227,4912204930ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013