Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Aldazábal y Lodeña

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1741Born
1765²23.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 180765.3AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
11 Jun 180967.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
24 Jun 181270.5DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Aldazábal y Lodeña
Bishop Francisco Javier Aldazábal y Lodeña (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndahuaylas, Peru

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1808, Number 27
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,920
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 167
  • b: LB, 6 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast