Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Agustín Francisco de Otondo Escurruchea, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1760Born
1794²33.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
Jan 1816²55.2AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
13 Jun 182665.6DiedBishop-Elect of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Francisco de Otondo Escurruchea
Father Agustín Francisco de Otondo Escurruchea C.O. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlacePotosi

  • a priest for 32.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 167
  • b: LB, 6 Jun 2013
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast