Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís Victor Sartori

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1904Born
9 Jan 192722.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 195247.5AppointedBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
1 Jun 195247.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montes Claros, Brazil
10 Jan 195651.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
10 Jan 195651.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Celerina
14 Sep 196056.0SucceededBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
10 Apr 197065.6DiedBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luís Victor Sartori
Bishop Luís Victor Sartori (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Maria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaxias do Sul

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast