Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Passo Fundo

Archidioecesis Passofundensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Paulo Antônio de Conto, Apostolic Administrator
  • Antônio Carlos Altieri, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Pedro Ercílio Simon, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Urbano José Allgayer, Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 April 2011
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rio Grande do Sul
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 12,000 (4,635 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul 3
  • Web Site: http://www.pas.matrix.com.br/diocese-pf/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Coronel Chicuta 436, 99010-051 Passo Fundo; C.P. 230, 99001-970 Passo Fundo, RS, Brazil
  • Telephone: (054)3045-9240
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Passo Fundo
10 March 1951ErectedDiocese of Santa Maria Diocese of Passo Fundo (erected)
22 May 1961Territory LostDiocese of Passo Fundo
Diocese of Santa Maria
Diocese of Frederico Westphalen (erected)
27 May 1971Territory LostDiocese of Passo Fundo Diocese of Erexim (erected)
Archdiocese of Passo Fundo
13 April 2011ElevatedDiocese of Passo Fundo Archdiocese of Passo Fundo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Passo Fundo
1965650,000700,00092.9%72911633,98720460660ap1967
1970600,000631,00095.1%71741454,137113063166ap1971
1976390,000450,00086.7%41681093,577213235043ap1977
1980354,000403,00087.8%4751983,61229040043ap1981
1990402,000438,00091.8%65651303,092215946049ap1991
1999384,000480,00080.0%56721283,00018638452ap2000
2000376,000470,00080.0%62641262,98416338652ap2001
2001374,479468,09980.0%61651262,97215538352ap2002
2002374,479468,09980.0%62711332,81518938452ap2003
2003365,118468,09978.0%61631242,94414136453ap2004
2004366,397488,53075.0%59601193,07813033153ap2005
Archdiocese of Passo Fundo
2013432,000546,00079.1%61611223,54011732755ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.1.0, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 17 Jul 2015