Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Liro Vendelino Meurer

Bishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1954 BornSalvador do Sul
12 Dec 198127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
14 Jan 200954.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
14 Jan 200954.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
22 Mar 200954.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
24 Apr 201358.8AppointedBishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
16 Jun 201358.9InstalledBishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Liro Vendelino Meurer:
Bishop Liro Vendelino Meurer (born ) Bishop of Santo Ângelo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santo Ângelo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2009
  • Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 19, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,075
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2013
  • i: CB, 10 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013