Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Batista Becker

Deceased

Archbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1870Born
2 Aug 189626.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 190838.1AppointedBishop of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina), Brazil
13 Sep 190838.5Ordained BishopBishop of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina), Brazil
1 Aug 191242.4AppointedArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 Dec 191242.7InstalledArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Jun 194676.3DiedArchbishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Batista Becker
Archbishop João Batista Becker (born , died ) Archbishop of Porto Alegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSankt Wendel, Germany

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast