Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aparecido Donizete de Souza

Auxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

Titular Bishop of Macriana Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1964 BornPrimeiro de Maio
12 Dec 199228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil
30 Dec 201551.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
30 Dec 201551.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
18 Mar 201652.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor

MicroData Summary for Aparecido Donizete de Souza
Bishop Aparecido Donizete de Souza (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Porto Alegre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 30 Dec 2015
  • c2+: CB, 10 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 19 Mar 2016