Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urbano José Allgayer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1924Born
10 Dec 195026.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 197449.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Feb 197449.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
24 Mar 197450.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
4 Feb 198257.8AppointedBishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
19 May 199975.1RetiredBishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
14 May 201995.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Urbano José Allgayer
Bishop Urbano José Allgayer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Passo Fundo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Clara
Ordained BishopCathedral, Porto Alegre, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul
Death PlacePasso Fundo, Archdiocese of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul
Buried Place (Original)Irmãs de Notre Dame, Cemetery, Passo Fundo, Archdiocese of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: CB, 14 May 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,699

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast