Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Mário Stroeher

Bishop of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1939 BornFeliz
21 Dec 196324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
25 Mar 198344.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
25 Mar 198344.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicives
24 Jun 198344.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicives
8 Aug 198647.4AppointedBishop of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Mário Stroeher:
Bishop José Mário Stroeher (born ) Bishop of Rio Grande

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rio Grande.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013