Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aloísio Leo Arlindo Cardinal Lorscheider, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Aparecida, Sao Paulo

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1924BornPicada Geraldo
13 Mar 194621.4Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 Aug 194823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Feb 196237.3AppointedBishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
20 May 196237.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 Mar 197348.5AppointedArchbishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
24 May 197651.6Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197651.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
12 Jul 199570.8AppointedArchbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Jan 200479.3RetiredArchbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Dec 200783.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aloísio Leo Arlindo Lorscheider:
Aloísio Leo Arlindo Cardinal Lorscheider O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Aparecida

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
  • a cardinal for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 60
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014