Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gentil Delázari

Bishop of Sinop, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1940 BornRelvado
13 Jul 196827.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Feb 199453.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sinop, Mato Grosso, Brazil
27 Mar 199453.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Sinop, Mato Grosso, Brazil
22 Mar 199554.5SucceededBishop of Sinop, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gentil Delázari:
Bishop Gentil Delázari (born ) Bishop of Sinop

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sinop.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013