Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Baréa

Deceased

Bishop of Caxias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1893Born
2 Apr 191825.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 193542.6AppointedBishop of Caxias, Brazil
19 Jan 193643.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caxias, Brazil
19 Nov 195158.8DiedBishop of Caxias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Baréa
Bishop José Baréa (born , died ) Bishop of Caxias

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovo Treviso, Antônio Prado

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast